CA ACR173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Law Revision Commission.
Title
California Law Revision Commission: studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR173 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - ACR 173 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - ACR 173 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4723.) |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |