CA ACR168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-23)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Lunar New Year Celebration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lunar New Year Celebration.

Sponsors

Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-02-12AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 3968.)
2018-02-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 8).
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback