CA ACR161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-20)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 30th Annual State Scientist Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

30th Annual State Scientist Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR161 Limón et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2018-06-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4516.)
2018-06-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-10AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5094.)
2018-05-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-24AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-23AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback