CA ACR157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Louis Zamperini Memorial Highway.
Title
Louis Zamperini Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR157 Hadley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Assembly - ACR 157 HADLEY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Assembly - ACR 157 HADLEY Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4876.) |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4818.) |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |