CA ACR155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-16-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-16-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Family Physician Week.
Title
Family Physician Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR155 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-04-15 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3359.) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3817.) |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 10). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |