CA ACR15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-16-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-16-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Fitness Week.
Title
California Fitness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Special Consent ACR15 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 186.) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 275.) |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 28). |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |