CA ACR15 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-35-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-35-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Week.
Title
California Holocaust Memorial Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - ACR 15 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR15 Levine By Stone (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR15 Levine By Stone (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3130.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2690.) |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 876.) |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |