CA ACR148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-19-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-19-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Long Beach International Gateway Bridge.
Title
Long Beach International Gateway Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent ACR148 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - ACR 148 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - ACR 148 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4983.) |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4472.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |