CA ACR146 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to commemorating the 85th anniversary of Roberto Alvarez v. Board of Trustees of the Lemon Grove School District.
Title
Civil rights: Roberto Alvarez v. Board of Trustees of the Lemon Grove School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR146 Weber By Anderson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3739.) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4227.) |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |