CA ACR144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25)
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25)
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Korean American Day.
Title
Korean American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Special Consent ACR144 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3258.) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3777.) |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 8). |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |