CA ACR144 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-27)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-27)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Genocide Awareness and Prevention Month.
Title
Genocide Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR144 Blumenfield By Liu (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:55 a.m. | |
2010-04-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-04-29 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3381.) | |
2010-04-21 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-04-19 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4713.) | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2010-03-23 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-03-11 | From printer. | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced. To print. |