CA ACR143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-20)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a Day of Remembrance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Day of Remembrance.

Sponsors

Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR143 Muratsuchi et al. By Pan (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2018.
2018-03-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
2018-03-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-03-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4318.)
2018-02-28SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4064.)
2018-02-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 16).
2018-02-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-01-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-04AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback