CA ACR141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 17).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to India Republic Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

India Republic Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 17).
2020-01-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-01-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback