CA ACR139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Esther Padilla Memorial Highway.
Title
Esther Padilla Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR139 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - ACR 139 Arambula Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - ACR 139 Arambula Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4378.) |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.) |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |