CA ACR135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Energy Efficiency Day.
Title
Energy Efficiency Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - ACR 135 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR135 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 135 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR135 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 135 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3251.). |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2717.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2910.) |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |