CA ACR133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Finnish Independence Centennial.
Title
Finnish Independence Centennial observance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR133 Harper By Moorlach (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2844.) |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3147.) |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |