CA ACR127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-14 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Officer Robert W. Winget Memorial Overpass.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Officer Robert W. Winget Memorial Overpass.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-14 - Assembly - ACR 127 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-09-14AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3618.)
2019-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2019-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-08-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-08-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback