CA ACR126 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-20-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-20-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Katcho Achadjian Memorial Highway.
Title
Katcho Achadjian Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Assembly - ACR 126 Cunningham Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR126 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - ACR 126 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR126 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - ACR 126 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4683.) |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4469.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |