CA ACR126 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to family law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court Adoption and Permanency Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR126 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - ACR 126 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.)
2019-09-09SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2815.)
2019-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2019-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-08-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback