CA ACR122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diaper Need Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR122 Gonzalez et al. By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 122 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2588.)
2019-09-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2909.)
2019-08-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 22).
2019-08-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-13AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-08-12AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback