CA ACR117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-22-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-22-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Ronald Reagan Day.
Title
Ronald Reagan Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR117 Lackey By Bates (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 3131.) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3573.) |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 28). |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |