CA ACR117 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Hanren Chang Memorial.
Title
Hanren Chang Memorial.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - ACR 117 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR117 Ting (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - ACR 117 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR117 Ting (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - ACR 117 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5737.). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.) |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4765.) |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |