CA ACR111 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Diane Papan [D]Asm. Dawn Addis [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Juan Alanis [R]
Sen. Marie Alvarado-Gil [D]Asm. David Alvarez [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Jasmeet Bains [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Sen. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Damon Connolly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Diane Dixon [R]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]Asm. Bill Essayli [R]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matt Haney [D]Asm. Gregg Hart [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Josh Hoover [R]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Corey Jackson [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Joe Patterson [R]
Asm. Juan Carrillo [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Tina McKinnor [D]Sen. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Mike Fong [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]Asm. Liz Ortega [D]Asm. Blanca Pacheco [D]Asm. Gail Pellerin [D]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Sen. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Kate Sanchez [R]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Esmeralda Soria [D]Asm. Stephanie Nguyen [D]Asm. Tri Ta [R]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Avelino Valencia [D]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Greg Wallis [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Sen. Akilah Weber Pierson [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Lori Wilson [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]Asm. Rick Zbur [D]

Roll Calls

2023-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR111 Papan et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - Assembly - ACR 111 Papan Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-14 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.)
2023-09-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-08-30SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-28SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2023-08-24AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2799.)
2023-08-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-08-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 17).
2023-08-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-08-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-08-15AssemblyFrom printer.
2023-08-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback