CA ACR110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to reproductive care and abortion services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to reproductive care and abortion services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - ACR 110 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-09-06SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-09-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 3035.)
2019-09-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 26).
2019-07-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-28AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback