CA ACR109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to extreme weather.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extreme heat: state response.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14AssemblyOrdered to Consent Calendar.
2022-01-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2022-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12AssemblyAmended.
2022-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10).
2022-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-09-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-08-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-08-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback