CA ACR108 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-26-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-26-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women's Military History Week.
Title
Women's Military History Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Assembly - ACR 108 MATHIS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR108 Mathis By Vidak (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR108 Mathis By Vidak (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3888.). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3171.) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3439.) |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 15). |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |