CA ACR106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-14)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-14)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Sri Lankan Independence Day.
Title
Sri Lankan Independence Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Special Consent ACR106 Kalra et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - ACR 106 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - ACR 106 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-03-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3161.) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3409.) |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-08-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |