CA ACR105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-16-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a sister state relationship with the Province of Syunik.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sister state relationship with the Province of Syunik.

Sponsors

Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-09-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-09-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-03AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 2).
2021-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
2021-08-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended.
2021-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
2021-08-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-08-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback