CA ACR105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drug prices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-19 - Assembly - ACR 105 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-28SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-08-20SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-19AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2751.)
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback