CA ACR104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Philippine Independence Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Philippine Independence Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR104 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - ACR 104 Bonta Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2019-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-22SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.)
2019-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-14SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-27AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2458.)
2019-06-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2019-06-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-10AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback