CA ACR103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-14)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Latex Allergy Awareness Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent ACR103 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-23AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-11SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.)
2019-07-03SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-17AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2311.)
2019-06-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback