CA ACR101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Emergency Preparedness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR101 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.)
2021-09-07SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-09-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-08-23AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-08-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-08-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-08-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback