CA ACA8 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 6 of Article I thereof, relating to slavery.
Title
Slavery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - ACA 8 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 3439.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |