CA ACA8 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII thereof, and by amending Section 1 of Article XIII B thereof, relating to public finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wealth tax: appropriation limits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2022-04-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2022-04-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
2021-03-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback