CA ACA8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: voter qualifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACA 8 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-08-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-08-26AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2019-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2841.)
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
2019-08-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2019-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback