CA ACA8 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-10 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-10 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 1 of Article XIII A thereof, and by amending Section 18 of Article XVI thereof, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government financing: voter approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-15 - Assembly - ACA8 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2044.) |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2019.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |