CA ACA8 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 3 of Article I thereof, and by amending Sections 7 and 8 of, and adding Section 7.3 to, Article IV thereof, relating to meetings of the Legislature.
Title
Meetings of the Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Coms. on RULES and APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-01-13 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | |
2009-01-12 | Read first time. To print. |