CA ACA5 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 2 and 3 of Article XIX thereof, by amending Section 1 of Article XIXA thereof, and by amending Section 1 of Article XIXD thereof, relating to transportation.
Title
Motor vehicles: fuel taxes, sales and use taxes, and fees: expenditure restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220ACA5 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220ACA5#99INT |