CA ACA12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 5 and 6 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: nonpartisan office.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 16. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220ACA12 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220ACA12#99INT |