CA ACA11 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Sections 2.1, 2.2, and 2.3 to Article XIIIA thereof, relating to tax limitation.
Title
The Home Protection for Seniors, Severely Disabled, Families, and Victims of Wildfire or Natural Disasters Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] |
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - ACA 11 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA11 Mullin et al. By Galgiani (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - ACA 11 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA11 Mullin et al. By Galgiani (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - ACA 11 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 5. Page 4976.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 3847.) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 20 corrected. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 20 corrected. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 20 corrected. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3799.) |
2020-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.R. and E. & C.A. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1517.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |