CA ACA1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-19 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-19 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 1 and 4 of Article XIII A thereof, by amending Section 2 of, and by adding Section 2.5 to, Article XIII C thereof, by amending Section 3 of Article XIII D thereof, and by amending Section 18 of Article XVI thereof, relating to local finance.
Title
Local government financing: affordable housing and public infrastructure: voter approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - ACA 1 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 44. Noes 20. Page 2758.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |