CA ABX29 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 104420 and 104466 of, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 104559) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 103 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to tobacco use programs.
Title
Tobacco use programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB9 Thurmond By Liu (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB9 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB9 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session. | |
2016-05-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 115.). |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 8). |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 184.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 184.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 184.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 6. Page 185.) |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (September 8). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. |
2015-07-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104466 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104559 | New Code | See Bill Text |