CA ABX28 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17537.3, 22951, 22952, 22956, 22958, and 22963 of, and to add Section 22964 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 308 of the Penal Code, relating to tobacco.
Title
Tobacco products: minimum legal age.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (September 8). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. Read second time and amended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. |
2015-07-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17537.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22958 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22963 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22964 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |