CA ABX24 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6172 of, and to amend and repeal Section 17131.9 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 12302.2 and 12306.6 of, and to add Article 6.4 (commencing with Section 14197.100) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Managed care organization provider tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.H. & D.S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. |
2015-07-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12302.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12306.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |