CA ABX210 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 30111 and 30462 of, and to add Section 7284.8 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local taxes: authorization: cigarettes and tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB10 Bloom By McGuire (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB 10 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB 10 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Motion to Appeal the Decision of the Chair By GALLAGHER Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB 10 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - AB 10 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Motion to Appeal the Decision of the Chair By GALLAGHER Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 116.). |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 8). |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 178.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 178.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 178.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 179.) |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 25). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. |
2015-07-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30462 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7284.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |