CA AB999 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18418 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.58 and 23658 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credit: small business investment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and J., E.D., & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.58 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18418 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23658 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB999 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB999 |