CA AB998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Title 5.3 (commencing with Section 13750) of, to add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 13750) to Title 5.3 of, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 13752) to Title 5.3 of, Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multidisciplinary teams: human trafficking and domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 998 GRAYSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-08-06SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-30SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2018-05-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-16SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1897.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1052New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code694Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback