CA AB996 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 36 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: continuing education: conflict-of-interest policy.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 996 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 996 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1742.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |