CA AB994 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13665 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: social media.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 994 Jackson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB994 Jackson et al. By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 994 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB994 Jackson et al. By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 994 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 3027.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2374.). |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 1739.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 25). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13665 | Amended Code | Citation Text |