CA AB991 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3212, 3212.1, 3212.15, 3212.6, 3212.8, 3212.85, 3212.9, and 3212.11 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: presumed injuries.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3212.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |